Kam Wang Kong
Director/Miembro de la Junta en Enriched Goldenroad Financial Services Holdings Ltd. .
Cargos activos de Kam Wang Kong
Empresas | Cargo | Inicio | Fin |
---|---|---|---|
Enriched Goldenroad Financial Services Holdings Ltd.
Enriched Goldenroad Financial Services Holdings Ltd. Financial ConglomeratesFinance Enriched Goldenroad Financial Services Holdings Ltd. is an investment holding company. engages in the provision of credit facilities. It offers money lending services to individual and corporate clients. The company was founded on November 18, 2015 and is headquartered in Hong Kong. | Director/Miembro de la Junta | 01/01/2016 | - |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 01/01/2016 | - |
Historial de carrera de Kam Wang Kong
Antiguos cargos conocidos de Kam Wang Kong.
Empresas | Cargo | Inicio | Fin |
---|---|---|---|
WLS HOLDINGS LIMITED | Director/Miembro de la Junta | 01/06/2002 | 16/11/2022 |
Director Ejecutivo | 01/06/2002 | 16/11/2022 | |
CHINA COME RIDE NEW ENERGY GROUP LIMITED | Director/Miembro de la Junta | 21/11/2016 | 28/08/2019 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 21/11/2016 | 28/08/2019 | |
First Pacific Bank Ltd. | Corporate Officer/Principal | 01/06/1989 | 01/02/2002 |
Security Pacific Asian Bank
Security Pacific Asian Bank Major BanksFinance Part of Bank of America Corp., Security Pacific Asian Bank is a Malaysian commercial banking company. | Corporate Officer/Principal | 01/06/1985 | 01/07/1988 |
Sanfield-WLS Safety Equipment Ltd. | Director/Miembro de la Junta | - | - |
Wui Loong Construction (China) Co. Ltd. | Director/Miembro de la Junta | - | - |
WLS New Energy Co. Ltd. | Director/Miembro de la Junta | - | - |
W.J. McLaren Interior Design Ltd. | Director/Miembro de la Junta | - | - |
░░░░ ░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | - | - |
Formación de Kam Wang Kong.
The Chinese University of Hong Kong | Undergraduate Degree |
Estadísticas
Internacional
Hong-Kong | 9 |
Bermudas | 2 |
Islas Caimán | 2 |
Operativa
Director/Board Member | 8 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 2 |
Corporate Officer/Principal | 2 |
Sectorial
Finance | 3 |
Industrial Services | 2 |
Consumer Services | 2 |
Funciones ocupadas
Activas
Inactivas
Empresas cotizadas
Empresas privadas
Empresas relacionadas
Empresas cotizadas | 2 |
---|---|
WLS HOLDINGS LIMITED | Industrial Services |
CHINA COME RIDE NEW ENERGY GROUP LIMITED | Commercial Services |
Empresas privadas | 8 |
---|---|
Enriched Goldenroad Financial Services Holdings Ltd.
Enriched Goldenroad Financial Services Holdings Ltd. Financial ConglomeratesFinance Enriched Goldenroad Financial Services Holdings Ltd. is an investment holding company. engages in the provision of credit facilities. It offers money lending services to individual and corporate clients. The company was founded on November 18, 2015 and is headquartered in Hong Kong. | Finance |
Security Pacific Asian Bank
Security Pacific Asian Bank Major BanksFinance Part of Bank of America Corp., Security Pacific Asian Bank is a Malaysian commercial banking company. | Finance |
First Pacific Bank Ltd. | |
Mega Win International Enterprise Ltd. | |
W.J. McLaren Interior Design Ltd. | |
WLS New Energy Co. Ltd. | |
Wui Loong Construction (China) Co. Ltd. | |
Sanfield-WLS Safety Equipment Ltd. |
- Bolsa de valores
- Insiders
- Kam Wang Kong
- Experiencia